EP0234777 - Snap lock connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickinson, Gene D. 251 The Colonnads Porchester Terrace North London W.2 / GB | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300982.3 | 04.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | US19860830416 | 18.02.1986 Original published format: US 830416 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234777 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234777 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234777 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/12 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
F16L37/098 (EP,US);
F16L37/0987 (EP,US);
Y10S285/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/36] | Title | German: | Schnappverriegelungs-Verbindung | [1987/36] | English: | Snap lock connector | [1987/36] | French: | Connexion à verrouillage encliquetable | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 29.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2516907 (PENFOLD CHARLES S); | [A]US2516883 (KELLY GEORGE M); | [A]DE2132181 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [A]US2102802 (EINAR LOFGREN GUSTAF); | [A]CH403414 (AMF OVERSEAS CORP [CH]); | [AD]US4266814 (GALLAGHER STEPHEN F); | [AD]US3245703 (MANLY ROBERT S) |