EP0232169 - Alkaline protease produced by a bacillus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENEX CORPORATION 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg Maryland 20877 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states GENEX CORPORATION 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg Maryland 20877 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durham, Donald R. 20617 Beaver Ridge Road Gaithersburg Maryland 20879 / US | 02 /
McNamee, Clyde G. 14 Irish Court Gaithersburg Maryland 20878 / US | 03 /
Stellwag, Edmund J. 1 Nickelby Court Damascus Maryland 20872 / US | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Holmes, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300994.8 | 04.02.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | US19860826378 | 05.02.1986 Original published format: US 826378 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232169 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232169 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/54, C12N1/20, C11D3/386, C11D7/42, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:07) | [1987/33] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP,US);
C12N9/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | Durch einen Bazillus produzierte alkalische Protease | [1987/33] | English: | Alkaline protease produced by a bacillus | [1987/33] | French: | Protéase alcaline produite par un bacillus | [1987/33] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/28] | 23.02.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2521163 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) |