EP0234820 - A process for producing 0,0-dilower-alkylchlorothiophosphate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohsu, Motomasa 7-25 Hoshigoecho Niihama-shi / JP | 02 /
Kamemoto, Koichi 10-5-405 Sonehigashinocho-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | 03 /
Yahata, Manabu 14-5 Akeno-Koyodai Oita-shi / JP | 04 /
Tokumaru, Tooru 1770-29 Oaza Koikebaru Oita-shi / JP | 05 /
Hioki, Takeshi 6-4 Nakano-4-chome Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka / JP | 06 /
Ueda, Hiroshi 2203 Higashiakeno Oita-shi / JP | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1987/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301247.0 | 13.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | JP19860035569 | 20.02.1986 Original published format: JP 3556986 | JP19860288576 | 02.12.1986 Original published format: JP 28857686 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234820 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234820 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234820 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/20 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
C07F9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 0,0-Di-niedrig-alkyl-chlorothiophosphaten | [1987/36] | English: | A process for producing 0,0-dilower-alkylchlorothiophosphate | [1987/36] | French: | Procédé pour produire des 0,0-chlorothiophosphates de dialcoyles inférieurs | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CS166992 ; | [X]US3336422 (PETERSON WILLARD D); | [Y]DD109639 ; | [Y]FR2059785 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, no. 5, 1st August 1977, page 465, abstract no. 38866w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & CS-A-166 992 (S. TRUCHLIK et al.) 15-01-1977, & CS166992 A 00000000 | Examination | US3723580 | - E. Fitzer; W. Fritz "Technische Chemie"; 1975, ISBN 3-540-06787-6 pages 322-324 |