EP0278141 - Wheel assembly and method and apparatus for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINER ENTERPRISES INC 1200 East State Street Geneva Illinois 60134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states MINER ENTERPRISES INC 1200 East State Street Geneva Illinois 60134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toms, Robert S., Jr. 3S651 Burk Road Warrenville Illinois 60555 / US | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301261.1 | 13.02.1987 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278141 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278141 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
B60B33/0028 (EP);
B60B33/0063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Radzusammenstellung, Methode, sowie Apparatur zu deren Herstellung | [1988/33] | English: | Wheel assembly and method and apparatus for making same | [1988/33] | French: | Assemblage de roue, ainsi que méthode et dispositif pour l'assembler | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 28.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.02.1991 | SE | 14.02.1991 | CH | 28.02.1991 | LI | 28.02.1991 | [1992/07] |
Former [1992/06] | GB | 13.02.1991 | |
SE | 14.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/48] | SE | 14.02.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2261465 ; | [A]US2100542 ; | [A]FR2534191 ; | [E]US4666215 |