EP0240149 - Light array assembly for photoactivation patient treatment system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Spring House Pennsylvania / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Spring House Pennsylvania / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Troutner, Vernon H. 6221 58th Avenue North St. Petersburg, FL 33709 / US | 02 /
King, Martin J. 12400 91st Avenue North Seminole, FL 33542 / US | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301694.3 | 26.02.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | US19860834256 | 27.02.1986 Original published format: US 834256 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0240149 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240149 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
A61M1/3681 (EP,US);
A61M1/36225 (EP,US);
A61M1/36226 (EP,US);
A61M1/362262 (EP,US);
A61M1/3683 (EP,US);
A61M1/3696 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsanordnung für ein System zur Behandlung eines Patienten durch Photoaktivierung | [1987/41] | English: | Light array assembly for photoactivation patient treatment system | [1987/41] | French: | Installation d'éclairage destinée à un système de traitement d'un patient par photoactivation | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2100143 (EDELSON RICHARD LESLIE); | [AD]EP0138489 (EXTRACORPOREAL MED SPEC [US]) |