Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |
28.03.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] |
29.05.1990 | First examination report | |
05.04.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] |
24.11.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 11.01.1989 [1989/02] |
01.08.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.09.1987 [1987/38] |