EP0237302 - Automotive two-wheeled vehicle rear wheel mounting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seino, Tatsuji No. 3-26-8, Higashimizuhodai Fujimi-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Oshikiri, Nobuo No. 1817-2, Kasahada Kawagoe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301982.2 | 06.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860032891 | 07.03.1986 Original published format: JP 3289186 | JP19860032892 | 07.03.1986 Original published format: JP 3289286 | JP19860032893 | 07.03.1986 Original published format: JP 3289386 | JP19860033434 | 08.03.1986 Original published format: JP 3343486 | JP19860050793 | 08.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5079386 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237302 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237302 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237302 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B62K25/28 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
B62K25/005 (EP,US);
B62K25/283 (EP);
B62K25/286 (EP,US);
F16C19/54 (EP,US);
F16C2326/20 (EP,US);
F16C35/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/38] | Title | German: | Hinterradaufhängungsbefestigung für Zweiradfahrzeug | [1987/38] | English: | Automotive two-wheeled vehicle rear wheel mounting structure | [1987/38] | French: | Montage de suspension de roue arrière pour véhicule automoteur à deux roues | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4553622 (DE CORTANZE ANDRE [FR]); | [A]DE1132461 (MOTOBECANE ATELIERS); | [E]FR2604411 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |