EP0238239 - A method of and apparatus for moulding a thermoplastics member with a fusion pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glynwed Tubes & Fittings Limited Headland House New Coventry Road Sheldon Birmingham B26 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states Glynwed Tubes & Fittings Limited Headland House New Coventry Road Sheldon Birmingham B26 3AZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewen, Alexander Thomas Edmund 33 Shooters Drive Nazing Essex / GB | 02 /
Hewitt, David Anthony 167 Handside Lane Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire / GB | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87301989.7 | 09.03.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | GB19860006790 | 19.03.1986 Original published format: GB 8606790 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238239 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238239 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/18, F16L47/02, // B29L31:24 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
B29D23/005 (EP,US);
B29C45/14311 (EP,US);
B29C70/68 (EP,US);
F16L47/03 (EP,US);
F16L47/32 (EP,US);
B29C45/00 (EP,US);
B29C65/342 (EP,US);
B29C65/3476 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1987/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Formen eines thermoplastischen Gegenstandes mit einem Schweisseinsatz | [1987/39] | English: | A method of and apparatus for moulding a thermoplastics member with a fusion pad | [1987/39] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le moulage d'une pièce en matière plastique pourvue d'un insert de soudage | [1987/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 28.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/14] | 04.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57039922 ; | [A]US4455482 (GRANDCLEMENT GERARD [FR]); | [A]GB2137297 (FUSION PLASTICS LTD); | [A]CH528697 (ROLLMAPLAST AG KUNSTSTOFFROHR [CH]); | [A]EP0145581 (RECH ET D APPLIC DES PLASTIQUE [FR]); | [A]EP0119061 (VICTAULIC PLC [GB], et al); | [A]WO8503906 (FIBER MECH [SE]) | [A] - JAPANESE PATENTS GAZETTE, week E15, 26th May 1982, Section Ch, Class A32, page 6, abstract no. 29757E/15, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-57 039 922 (IDEMITSU KOSAN K.K.) 03-05-1982, & JP57039922 A 00000000 |