Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
30.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] |
15.12.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.01.1991 [1991/05] |
21.11.1989 | First examination report | |
08.08.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.09.1989 [1989/39] |
31.05.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 19.07.1989 [1989/29] |
01.08.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.09.1987 [1987/38] |