EP0237361 - Semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furutani, Kiyohiro C/O Mitsubishi Denki K.K. LSI Kenkyusho 1, Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Mashiko, Koichiro C/O Mitsubishi Denki K.K. LSI Kenkyusho 1, Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Arimoto, Kazutami C/O Mitsubishi Denki K.K. LSI Kenkyusho 1, Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302183.6 | 13.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860056120 | 13.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5612086 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237361 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237361 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237361 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/10, G11C11/40 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
H10B12/37 (EP,US);
Y10S257/911 (EP,US);
Y10S257/922 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/38] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeichervorrichtung | [1987/38] | English: | Semiconductor memory device | [1987/38] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire semi-conducteur | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 28.09.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0169346 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [T]EP0234741 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) |