EP0238343 - Solid state image pick-up device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamasaki, Masaharu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Kikue c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kagawa, Yoshiaki c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Tomoyuki c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Yonemoto, Kazuya c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302385.7 | 19.03.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | JP19860061785 | 19.03.1986 Original published format: JP 6178586 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238343 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238343 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238343 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
H01L27/14887 (EP,US);
H01L27/14 (KR);
H04N25/625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/39] | Title | German: | Festkörperabbildungsgerät | [1987/39] | English: | Solid state image pick-up device | [1987/39] | French: | Dispositif de prise de vues monolithique | [1987/39] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/09: Teilanmeldung 94101121.5 eingereicht am 19/03/87 | EPB 1995/09: Divisional application 94101121.5 filed on 19/03/87 | EPB 1995/09: Demande divisionnaire 94101121.5 déposée le 19/03/87 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 25.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.1994 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94101121.5 / EP0594559 | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3119032 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]); | [A]DE3328607 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0174133 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [AP]US4579626 (WALLACE LLOYD F [US]) |