EP0238350 - Compact disc holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOTHIC PRINT FINISHERS LIMITED Biggin Hill Airport Industrial Estate Main Road Biggin Hill Westerham, Kent TN16 3BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states GOTHIC PRINT FINISHERS LIMITED Biggin Hill Airport Industrial Estate Main Road Biggin Hill Westerham, Kent TN16 3BW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harvey, Albert Harold 100 Sandy Lane Cheam Surrey / GB | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302398.0 | 19.03.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | GB19860006967 | 20.03.1986 Original published format: GB 8606967 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238350 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238350 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03, G11B23/033, G11B33/04 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
G11B33/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/39] | G11B23/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1987/39] | Title | German: | Plattenhalter | [1987/39] | English: | Compact disc holder | [1987/39] | French: | Support pour disque compact | [1987/39] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 12.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/34] | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.04.1990 | 02.04.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0020219 [ ]; | DE3425579 [ ]; | EP0159860 [ ] |