EP0241285 - Antibiotic A42125 and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamill, Robert L. 617 Brookview Drive Greenwood Indiana 46142 / US | 02 /
Kastner, Ralph Emil 243 Webb Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46227 / US | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303082.9 | 09.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | US19860850786 | 11.04.1986 Original published format: US 850786 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241285 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241285 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241285 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07G11/00, C12P1/04, C12N15/00 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
C12P1/06 (EP,US);
C12N1/00 (KR);
A23K20/195 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/11] |
Former [1987/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Antibiotikum A42125 und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1987/42] | English: | Antibiotic A42125 and process for its production | [1987/42] | French: | Antibiotique A42125 et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1987/42] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 15.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0115350 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [A]US4524145 (MATSON JAMES A [US]) | [A] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 26, no. 34, 1985, pages 4011-4014, London, GB; D.E. NETTLETON et al.: "Isolation and structure of rebeccamycin - a new antitumor antibiotic from nocardia aerocoligenes" |