Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] |
23.06.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] |
17.06.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] |
07.12.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] |
16.10.1990 | First examination report | |
26.05.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.07.1988 [1988/28] |
09.01.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.02.1988 [1988/08] |