EP0244107 - Plasticiser compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 0SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 0SU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clutterbuck, Paul Geoffrey BP Chemicals Limited Hayes Road Sully Penarth South Glamorgan CF6 2YU / GB | 02 /
Wilson, Alan Stuart BP Chemicals Limited Hayes Road Sully Penarth South Glamorgan CF6 2YU / GB | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303110.8 | 09.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | GB19860009542 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: GB 8609542 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244107 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/10, C08K5/37, C08L21/00 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
C08K5/12 (EP);
C08K5/10 (EP);
C08K5/372 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/10, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/12, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/372, C08L21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Weichmacherzusammensetzungen | [1987/45] | English: | Plasticiser compositions | [1987/45] | French: | Compositions de plastifiants | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/18] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1100356 ; | [A]GB1005169 ; | [A]DE2759162 | [A] - C.M. BLOW et al.: "Rubber technology and manufacture", 2nd edition, 1982, page 233, Butterworth Scientific, London, GB |