EP0245967 - Vulcanization of ethylene/alpha-olefin rubbers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1994 [1994/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takao, Hiroyoshi 7-16, Kurosunadai-3-chome Chiba-shi / JP | 02 /
Tanimoto, Yoshio 4338-79, Joza Sakura-shi / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Kiyosi 152-1, Ichihara Ichihara-shi / JP | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Lamb, John Baxter, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | Lamb, John Baxter, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303292.4 | 14.04.1987 | [1987/47] | Priority number, date | JP19860085802 | 14.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8580286 | [1987/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0245967 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0245967 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245967 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08J3/24, C08K5/00, C08K3/36, // (C08L23/16, C08K3:36) | [1987/47] | CPC: |
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08L19/00 (KR);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435, C08L23/16 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/47] | Title | German: | Vulkanisieren von Äthylen/alpha-Olefin-Gummis | [1987/47] | English: | Vulcanization of ethylene/alpha-olefin rubbers | [1987/47] | French: | Vulcanisation de caoutchoucs d'éthylène/alpha-oléfine | [1987/47] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 13.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4467061 (YAMAMOTO NOBORU [JP], et al); | [Y]DE3343676 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [A]BE679764 ; | [A]DE2611208 (MONTEFIBRE SPA); | [A]EP0078603 (ICI PLC [GB]) |