EP0245975 - Environmentally sealed connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) 470 Friendship Road P.O. Box 3608 Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thakrar, Anil C. 533 Springhouse Road Camp Hill Pennsylvania 17011 / US | 02 /
Redmond, John Peter 5213 Deerfield Avenue Mechanicsburg Pennsylvania 17055 / US | 03 /
Schubert, Paul Clifford, Jr. 31 Gale Road Camp Hill Pennsylvania 17011 / US | 04 /
Snyder, Clair Wilson, Jr. Route No. 24 Box 1040 York Pennsylvania 17406 / US | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1987/47] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303571.1 | 23.04.1987 | [1987/47] | Priority number, date | US19860862902 | 13.05.1986 Original published format: US 862902 | [1987/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245975 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245975 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52, H01R43/18 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
B29C45/1676 (EP,US);
H01R43/00 (KR);
B29C45/1635 (EP,US);
H01R13/5219 (EP,US);
H01R43/18 (EP,US);
H01R13/5205 (EP,US);
H01R43/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/47] | Title | German: | Umgebungsdichter Verbinder | [1987/47] | English: | Environmentally sealed connector | [1987/47] | French: | Connecteur étanche à l'environnement | [1987/47] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.04.1993 | [2004/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1415657 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [AD]US3838382 (SUGAR J); | [AD]US4090759 (HERRMANN JR HENRY OTTO); | [A]GB2068654 (ITT); | [AD]EP0114479 (AMP INC [US]) |