EP0246767 - Semiconductor memories [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebihara, Norio c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Takayuki c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Kita, Hiroyuki c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Ohsawa, Yoshihito c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1987/48] | Application number, filing date | 87303753.5 | 28.04.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | JP19860098847 | 28.04.1986 Original published format: JP 9884786 | JP19860100044 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: JP 10004486 | [1987/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0246767 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0246767 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246767 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F5/06 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
G06F5/16 (EP,US);
G11C7/1006 (EP,US);
G11C7/103 (EP,US);
G11C7/1075 (EP,US);
G11C8/16 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/48] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicher | [1987/48] | English: | Semiconductor memories | [1987/48] | French: | Mémoires à semi-conducteurs | [1987/48] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58133698 | [Y] - WESCON TECHNICAL PAPERS, vol. 16, 19th-22nd September 1972, pages 413.1 - 413.5, Western Electronic Show and Convention, Los Angeles, US; Y. HSIA: "Memory applications of the MNOS" | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-19, no. 6, December 1984, pages 999-1007, IEEE, New York, US; R. PINKHAM et al.: "A high speed dual port memory with simultaneous serial and random mode access for video applications" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 249 (P-234)[1394], 5th November 1983; & JP 58133698 A (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 09-08-1983, & JP58133698 A 00000000 | [A] - SMPTE JOURNAL, vol. 89, no. 4, April 1980, pages 257-262, Scarsdale, US; T. YOSHINO et al.: "Digital frame memory for still picture television receivers PASS encoding system and application" |