EP0250075 - ISDN D channel handler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th floor Montreal Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 600 de la Gauchetiere Street West Montreal Quebec H3B 4N7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kun, Randall Douglas 10 Cyrus Court Nepean Ontario, K2H 9C9 / CA | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303804.6 | 29.04.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | CA19860512045 | 20.06.1986 Original published format: CA 512045 | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250075 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250075 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L11/20, H04M11/06 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0428 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/52] | H04Q11/04, H04M11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | ISDN-D-Kanal-Bearbeitungsvorrichtung | [1987/52] | English: | ISDN D channel handler | [1987/52] | French: | Dispositif de traitement du canal D dans un système RNIS | [1987/52] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/17] | 29.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0178137 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | FR2472245 [ ] (TELEDIFFUSION FSE [FR]); | WO8505236 [ ] (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | WO8400836 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) |