Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
08.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] |
28.12.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 14.02.1990 [1990/07] |
07.09.1989 | Change - classification | published on 25.10.1989 [1989/43] |
07.11.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] |