Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] |
11.08.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] |
09.11.1989 | First examination report | |
27.06.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] |
07.12.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] |
17.10.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.12.1987 [1987/49] |