EP0244256 - Method for producing tubular plastic containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COURTAULDS PACKAGING INC. 8th Street and Hazlett Avenue Wheeling West Virginia 26003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states COURTAULDS PACKAGING INC. 8th Street and Hazlett Avenue Wheeling West Virginia 26003 / US | ||
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states WHEELING STAMPING COMPANY 8th Street and Hazlett Avenue Wheeling West Virginia 16003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holoubek, George H. 212 Roscoe Avenue Muscatine Iowa 52761 / US | 02 /
Rhoades, John J. 105 South Houser Muscatine Iowa 52761 / US | 03 /
Whitaker, George P. Old Trail Farm, R.D. No. 2 Triadelphia West Virginia 26059 / US | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87303903.6 | 30.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | US19860859475 | 02.05.1986 Original published format: US 859475 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0244256 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0244256 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244256 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/02, B29C49/00 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
B29C51/02 (EP);
B29C49/071 (EP);
B29C2949/072 (EP);
B29C2949/073 (EP);
B29C2949/0773 (EP);
B29C2949/078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von rohrförmigen Kunststoffbehältern | [1987/45] | English: | Method for producing tubular plastic containers | [1987/45] | French: | Procédé pour la production de récipients tubulaires en matière plastique | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 11.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2678471 (BARTON MURRAY M); | [AD]US3047910 (DOWNS MYRON H); | [A]US3354603 (KATZEW CHARLES J, et al); | [X]FR1523482 (NORMANDE D HUILERIE SOC); | [X]US3603217 (WRIGHT CHARLES E, et al); | [AD]FR2226325 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) |