EP0244259 - Method of detecting the presence or absence of defect of transparent circuit board having fine transparent electric conductive circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINTO PAINT CO., LTD. 10-73, Minami-Tsukaguchicho 6-chome Amagasaki / JP | [1987/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tameyuki, Suzuki 1-7 Yamanone 3-chome Zushi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Junichi, Yasukawa 13-13, Higashikaigan Minami, 2-chome Chigasaki Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Toyokazu, Nomura 1-1 Higashi Narashino 5-chome Narashino Chiba-ken / JP | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303908.5 | 30.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | JP19860101714 | 01.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10171486 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244259 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244259 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/00, C25D13/12, G02F1/133 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
G01N21/91 (EP);
H05K1/0269 (EP);
G01N2021/95638 (EP);
H05K2201/0108 (EP);
H05K2201/0326 (EP);
H05K2203/135 (EP);
H05K2203/161 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1987/45] | G01M11/00, C25D13/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung der An- oder Abwesenheit von Fehlern an transparenten Leiterplatten, welche einen dünnen transparenten Schaltkreis besitzen | [1987/45] | English: | Method of detecting the presence or absence of defect of transparent circuit board having fine transparent electric conductive circuit | [1987/45] | French: | Méthode pour détecter l'existence ou l'absence de défauts de cartes imprimées transparentes ayant un circuit électriquement conducteur transparent de faible épaisseur | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/08] | 28.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0071872 [ ] |