EP0245097 - Cuff construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maleh de Buenos, Anne 504 East Jones Street Savannah Georgia 31401 / US | For all designated states Maleh de Buenos, Jane 425 Riverside Drive New York New York 10025 / US | For all designated states Sylverst, Leroy M. 910 Riverside Drive New York New York 10032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | For all designated states Maleh de Buenos, Anne 504 East Jones Street Savannah Georgia 31401 / US | ||
For all designated states Maleh de Buenos, Jane 425 Riverside Drive New York New York 10025 / US | |||
For all designated states Sylverst, Leroy M. 910 Riverside Drive New York New York 10032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/46] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304067.9 | 07.05.1987 | [1987/46] | Priority number, date | US19860860403 | 07.05.1986 Original published format: US 860403 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245097 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245097 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/10, A41D27/00 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
A41D19/0041 (EP,US);
A41D27/00 (EP,US);
A41D27/10 (EP,US);
Y10S2/912 (US);
Y10S2/917 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/46] | Title | German: | Stulpe | [1987/46] | English: | Cuff construction | [1987/46] | French: | Manchette | [1987/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 09.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2214105 (ESTHER HORDINER); | [A]US2274510 (MAX WOHL, et al); | [A]US2323136 (JOHANSON JOHANNA M); | [X]US2775771 (HEILBRONNER HARRY S); | [A]US2836828 (HENRIKSON NORMA M); | [X]FR1158637 (BAZAR DE L HOTEL DE VILLE); | [X]US4475253 (LAVECKIS REGINA G [US]); | [X]CA1182251 (MORATTO PATRICIA, et al) |