EP0290693 - Multi-spindle chucking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOFER-TECH CORPORATION 1800 Appleby Line Unit 4 Burlington, Ontario L7L 5P8 / CA | [1992/02] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states HOFER INDUSTRIES INC. 27 Strathearn Avenue Unit 3 Brampton Ontario L6T 4V6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichenhofer, Josef 52 Abbey Road Brampton Ontario, L6W 2T8 / CA | 02 /
Schubert, Karl P. 6700 Larchmont Drive Cleveland Ohio 44124 / US | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/46] | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304310.3 | 14.05.1987 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290693 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290693 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23B9/00 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
B23B9/08 (EP);
B23Q39/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Mehrspindel-Futter-Drehautomat | [1988/46] | English: | Multi-spindle chucking machine | [1988/46] | French: | Tour automatique multibroche à mandrin | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 18.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 15.10.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.1993 | CH | 11.08.1993 | FR | 11.08.1993 | IT | 11.08.1993 | LI | 11.08.1993 | SE | 11.08.1993 | ES | 22.11.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.08.1993 | |
CH | 11.08.1993 | ||
IT | 11.08.1993 | ||
LI | 11.08.1993 | ||
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
ES | 22.11.1993 | ||
FR | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.08.1993 | |
CH | 11.08.1993 | ||
IT | 11.08.1993 | ||
LI | 11.08.1993 | ||
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
FR | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 11.08.1993 | |
CH | 11.08.1993 | ||
LI | 11.08.1993 | ||
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
FR | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 11.08.1993 | |
CH | 11.08.1993 | ||
LI | 11.08.1993 | ||
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | CH | 11.08.1993 | |
LI | 11.08.1993 | ||
SE | 11.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/05] | CH | 11.08.1993 | |
LI | 11.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1829284 (LEWIS ARTHUR J); | [A]US3063131 (FENN RAYMOND T); | [A]US3339440 (TOYOSUKE TSUDA); | [A]DE1477880 ; | [A]DE1752738 (K MARTIN FA); | [A]GB1263135 (PITTLER AG MASCHF [DE]); | [A]DE2264899 (INDEX WERKE KG HAHN & TESSKY); | [X]DE3001390 (GIUSEPPE MINGANTI E C S P A); | [A]EP0113997 (BROWN JOHN MACHINE TOOLS [GB]) |