EP0262750 - Very large scale parallel computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THINKING MACHINES CORPORATION 245 First Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states THINKING MACHINES CORPORATION 245 First Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hillis, Daniel W. 135 St. Paul Street Brookline, Mass. / US | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/14] | McCallum, William Potter Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304461.4 | 20.05.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | US19860902290 | 29.08.1986 Original published format: US 902290 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262750 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262750 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262750 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/80, G06F11/16 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
G06F9/5066 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F12/0215 (EP,US);
G06F15/17343 (EP,US);
G06F15/17381 (EP,US);
G06F15/8023 (EP,US);
G06F15/803 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/5077 (EP,US);
G06F11/165 (EP,US);
G06F11/1658 (EP,US);
G06F11/2041 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/17] | G06F15/06, G06F11/16 | ||
Former IPC [1988/14] | G06F15/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | Parallel-Grossrechner | [1988/14] | English: | Very large scale parallel computer | [1988/14] | French: | Calculateur parallèle massif | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 17.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 01.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Request for further processing for: | 03.05.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.11.1995 | IT | 29.11.1995 | LI | 29.11.1995 | NL | 29.11.1995 | SE | 29.02.1996 | [2007/52] |
Former [2003/07] | CH | 29.11.1995 | |
IT | 29.11.1995 | ||
LI | 29.11.1995 | ||
NL | 29.11.1995 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 29.11.1995 | |
IT | 29.11.1995 | ||
LI | 29.11.1995 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | CH | 29.11.1995 | |
LI | 29.11.1995 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | SE | 29.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0132926 [ ] (HILLIS W DANIEL); | WO8502698 [ ] (PARALLEL COMPUTERS INC [US]) | Examination | - MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING, VOL. 16, NO. 2/3, SEPTEMBER-OCTOBER 1985, AMSTERDAM, NL; J. ANDRIESSEN: "SUPERMATRIX, AN INTERCONNECTION NETWORK" | - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, VOL. C-31, NO. 5, MAY 1982, PAGES 443-454, NEW YORK, US; G. ADAMS ET AL.: "THE EXTRA STAGE CUBE: A FAULT TOLERANT INTERCONNECTION NETWORK FOR SUPERSYSTEMS" | - IEEE COMPCON, 25-28TH FEBRUARY 1985, PAGES 294-298, NEW YORK, US; J.H. WENSLEY: "DEPENDABLE REAL TIME COMPUTING" | - IEEE CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, VOL. 1, 1-4TH DECEMBER, NEW YORK, US; P. SWAIN ET AL: "MULTIPROCESSOR IMPLEMENTATION OF IMAGE PATTERN RECOGNITION: A GENERAL APPROACH" | - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, VOL. 33, NO. 12, MAY 1985, PAGES 83-86, 88, 90, 92 HASBROUCK HEIGHTS, NEW JERSEY, US; R. WEISS: "COMPUTER ARCHITECTURES: VARIED BLUEPRINTS WILL LIFT SYSTEM SPEEDS TO DIZZYING HEIGHTS" |