EP0251489 - Process for producing 5'-guanylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 1-6-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohte-Machi Itchome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujio, Tatsuro 6-29-1, Sagamidai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Akihiko Hashimoto-Heights 1-2 3150, Noborito Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/01] | Application number, filing date | 87304689.0 | 27.05.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | JP19860127720 | 02.06.1986 Original published format: JP 12772086 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251489 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251489 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251489 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/32, C12P39/00, // C12N15/52 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP);
C12P19/02 (KR);
C12P19/32 (EP);
C12P39/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | C12P19/32, C12P39/00, // C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 5'-Guanyl-Säure | [1988/01] | English: | Process for producing 5'-guanylic acid | [1988/01] | French: | Procédé pour produire de l'acide 5'-guanilique | [1988/01] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 26.05.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 02.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7139070 ; | [YPD]EP0185092 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 7, 14th February 1972, page 218, no. 32874y, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-71 39 070 (KYOWA FERMENTATION INDUSTRY CO., LTD) 17-11-1971, & JP7139070 A 00000000 | [Y] - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 43, no. 8, 1979, pages 1739-1744; H. MATSUI et al.: "Production of guanosine by psicofuranine and decoyinine resistant mutants of Bacillus subtilis" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 4, August 1984, page 479, no. 53221h, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. FUJIO et al.: "Production of nucleic acid-related substances by fermentative processes. Part 52. Production of 5'-guanylic acid by enzymatic conversion of 5'-xanthylic acid", & J. FERMENT. TECHNOL. 1984, 62(2), 131-7 | [YP] - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 50, no. 7, July 1986, pages 1879-1884; A. MARUYAMA et al.: "Construction of a plasmid for high level expression of XMP aminase in Escherichia coli" |