Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0247884
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.06.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] |
30.12.1994 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |
24.06.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] |
02.04.1991 |
First examination report |
|
24.01.1989 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.03.1989 [1989/11] |
29.06.1988 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] |
01.06.1988 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.07.1988 [1988/29] |
17.10.1987 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.12.1987 [1987/49] |