EP0247884 - Magnetic toner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakashita, Kiichiro 7-205 Sunpark Hirao 1619 Hirao Ingai-shi Toyko / JP | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304748.4 | 28.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | JP19860122641 | 28.05.1986 Original published format: JP 12264186 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0247884 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0247884 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247884 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0247884 | Date: | 30.12.1994 | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/083, H01F1/11 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
G03G9/0837 (EP,US);
G03G9/0834 (EP,US);
G03G9/0836 (EP,US);
Y10S430/104 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/29] | G03G9/14, H01F1/11 | ||
Former IPC [1987/49] | G03G9/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/49] | Title | German: | Magnetischer Toner | [1987/49] | English: | Magnetic toner | [1987/49] | French: | Toner magnétique | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57201244 ; | [XP]EP0187434 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]); | [Y]DE3508379 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0160496 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 4, no. 1, January/February 1979, page 41; R.F.ZIOLO: "Magnetic toner materials" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 54 (P-180)[1199], 4th March 1983; & JP-A-57 201 244 (CANON K.K.) 09-12-1982, & JP57201244 A 00000000 |