EP0247901 - Apparatus for controlling the shape of a flexible spline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CHARLES STARK DRAPER LABORATORY, INC. 555 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139-3563 / US | [1987/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernardon, Edward 11 Cogswell Avenue No. 17 Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 87304799.7 | 01.06.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | US19860869088 | 30.05.1986 Original published format: US 869088 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0247901 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0247901 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D05B33/00, B25J13/08, B25J15/06 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
D05B33/00 (EP,US);
B25J15/0616 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1987/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einstellen der Form eines biegsamen länglichen Organs | [1987/49] | English: | Apparatus for controlling the shape of a flexible spline | [1987/49] | French: | Appareil pour définir la forme d'un organe flexible allongé | [1987/49] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0161749 (DRAPER LAB CHARLES S [US]); | [A]DE2453195 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) |