EP0252606 - Process for increasing the cetane number of diesel fuels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brownawell, Darrell William 320 Roberts Lane Scotch Plains New Jersey 07076 / US | 02 /
Gorbaty, Martin Leo 204 Twin Oaks Terrace Wetsfield New Jersey 07090 / US | 03 /
Liotta, Ronald RD 1, Box 125 Pittstown New Jersey 08867 / US | 04 /
Taylor, William Francis 1598 Brookside Road Mountainside New Jersey 07092 / US | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305023.1 | 05.06.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | US19860872167 | 09.06.1986 Original published format: US 872167 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252606 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252606 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10G27/04, C10G67/12, C10L1/02 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C10L1/026 (EP);
C10G27/04 (EP);
C10G53/14 (EP);
C10G67/14 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Cetanzahl von Dieselölen | [1988/02] | English: | Process for increasing the cetane number of diesel fuels | [1988/02] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter l'indice de cétane d'huiles diesel | [1988/02] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/18] | 05.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.10.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4494961 ; | [X]US2365220 ; | [Y]BE835374 ; | [A]EP0236021 ; | [AD]US2472152 |