EP0256631 - Treating composition for used frying oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Harshaw Chemical Company CN 40, Menlo Park Edison, New Jersey 08818 / US | [1988/47] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states FILTROL CORPORATION 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94643 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Dennis Riley 721 Sylvaner Drive Pleasanton 94566 / US | 02 /
Gallavan, Kevin Patrick 847 Rose Avenue, No. 3 Pleasanton 94566 / US | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305126.2 | 10.06.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | US19860896041 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: US 896041 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0256631 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0256631 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C11B3/10 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
B01J20/12 (EP,US);
B01J20/08 (EP,US);
B01J20/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/08] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von gebrauchtem Bratöl | [1988/08] | English: | Treating composition for used frying oil | [1988/08] | French: | Composition pour traiter les huiles à friture usées | [1988/08] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 03.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/27] | 05.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59129297 ; | [A]US2403088 (MALCOLM LAING KENNETH); | [A]GB685044 (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 23, December 1984, page 520, abstract no. 209490h, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 129 297 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD) 25-07-1984, & JP59129297 A 00000000 |