blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0251542

EP0251542 - Oral composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.07.1988
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LION CORPORATION
3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/01]For all designated states
LION CORPORATION
3-7, Honjo 1-chome
Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ueki, Takao
2-2-12, Sakurayama
Zushi-shi Kanagawa / JP
02 / Suganuma, Nobuo
1-3-25, Yashiki
Narashino-shi Chiba / JP
03 / Gomi, Tetsuo
3-24-7, Kouyama Ñerima-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2007/32]
Former [1988/01]01 / Ueki, Takao
2-2-12, Sakurayama
Zushi-shi Kanagawa / JP
02 / Suganuma, Nobuo
1-3-25, Yashiki
Narashino-shi Chiba / JP
03 / Gomi, Tetsuo
3-24-7, Kouyama Nerima-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Fisher, Bernard, et al
Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon
Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/01]Fisher, Bernard, et al
Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road
Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
Application number, filing date87305265.812.06.1987
[1988/01]
Priority number, dateJP1986015254127.06.1986         Original published format: JP 15254186
[1988/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0251542
Date:07.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0251542
Date:08.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.1988
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/26, A61K7/16
[1988/17]
CPC:
A61K8/27 (EP); A61K8/34 (EP); A61K8/922 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP)
Former IPC [1988/01]A61K7/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1988/01]
TitleGerman:Präparat zur oralen Verwendung[1988/01]
English:Oral composition[1988/01]
French:Composition buccale[1988/01]
File destroyed:29.08.1994
Examination procedure22.06.1987Examination requested  [1988/01]
11.07.1988Application withdrawn by applicant  [1988/35]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3001575  ;
 [YP]GB2173701  ;
 [Y]EP0026539  ;
 [YD]EP0162574
 [A]  - N.F. ESTRIN et al.: "CTFA cosmetic ingredient dictionary", 3rd edition, 1982, The Cosmetic, Tioletry and Fragrance Association, Inc., WashingtonUS
 [A]  - H. JANISTYN: "Handbuch der Kosmetika und Riechstoffe", vol. 1, 3rd edition, 1978, Dr. Alfred H}thig Verlag, HeidelbergDE
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.