EP0251551 - Switching power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION 201 Washington Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoover, Alan Anderson Rural Route 2 Box 124 New Palestine Indiana / US | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/01] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305317.7 | 16.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | US19860878234 | 25.06.1986 Original published format: US 878234 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251551 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251551 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251551 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/185, H04N5/63, H02M3/335 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
H04N3/185 (EP,US);
H04N5/63 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | H04N3/185, H04N5/63 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/01] | Title | German: | Schaltnetzteil | [1988/01] | English: | Switching power supply | [1988/01] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation à découpage | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2807219 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | EP0140580 [ ] (FARNELL INSTR [GB]); | US4368409 [ ] (SIVANESAN APPUKUDDY [FR], et al); | US4335423 [ ] (KOIZUMI AKIO, et al) |