EP0251558 - Clay stabilizing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollenbeak, Keith H. Route 5 Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | 02 /
Brown, Paul S., Jr. 2217 West Spruce Duncan Oklahoma 73533 / US | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305334.2 | 16.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | US19860878160 | 25.06.1986 Original published format: US 878160 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251558 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251558 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/25 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C09K8/608 (EP,US);
C09K8/145 (EP,US);
Y10S507/922 (EP,US);
Y10S507/925 (EP,US);
Y10S507/933 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/01] | Title | German: | Tonstabilisierungsmittel | [1988/01] | English: | Clay stabilizing agent | [1988/01] | French: | Agent stabilisant l'argile | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/47] | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3375233 (SUSUMU HARADA, et al); | [AP]US4374739 (MCLAUGHLIN HOMER C, et al); | [A]GB2150578 (PENNWALT CORP) |