EP0295343 - Method for producing ceramic honeycomb structural body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otaka, Masashi 778-2 Ohaza-Obuke Asahi-cho Mie-gun Mie Pref / JP | 02 /
Asai, Showji 59-1 Iwato-cho 4-chome Minami-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref / JP | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1988/51] | Application number, filing date | 87305335.9 | 16.06.1987 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295343 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295343 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00, // B01J35/04, F01N3/02, B01D46/10 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
B01J37/00 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines keramischen strukturellen Körpers mit Wabenstruktur | [1988/51] | English: | Method for producing ceramic honeycomb structural body | [1988/51] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un corps structural en matière céramique en nid d'abeilles | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1987 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0042302 |