EP0250234 - Use of specific immunomodulators in treating viral-induced immunodeficiencies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEWTHERAPEUTICS LIMITED 10 John Street London WC1N 2EB / GB | [1987/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lefesvre, Andre 3 bis Rue du General Leclerc F-78110 Le Vesinet / FR | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305389.6 | 17.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | GB19860014733 | 17.06.1986 Original published format: GB 8614733 | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0250234 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/05, A61K35/14, A61K39/00, A61K35/26, C12N5/00 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
A61K35/26 (EP);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (EP,US);
A61K35/407 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Verwendung spezifischer Immunomodulatoren zur Behandlung virusinduzierter Immundefektsyndrome | [1987/52] | English: | Use of specific immunomodulators in treating viral-induced immunodeficiencies | [1987/52] | French: | Emploi d'immunomodulateurs spécifiques pour le traitement des syndromes d'immunodéficience induits par des virus | [1987/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/13] | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1443948 [ ] (PIKTOR LTD); | US3991182 [ ] (SPITLER LYNN E, et al); | US4132776 [ ] (JETER WAYBURN S); | US4180627 [ ] (FUDENBERG HERMAN H [US], et al); | EP0010738 [ ] (BENZON AS ALFRED [DK]); | GB1592954 [ ] (INT INST OF DIFFERENTIATION); | EP0042064 [ ] (GOTTLIEB ARTHUR A); | EP0051216 [ ] (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | EP0109089 [ ] (GOTTLIEB ARTHUR A); | DE2064296 [ ]; | US4521407 [ ] (PELHAM RUSSELL W [US], et al); | EP0165120 [ ] (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) |