EP0281701 - Synthetic in-mold label [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTI-COLOR CORPORATION 4575 Eastern Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45226 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states MULTI-COLOR CORPORATION 4575 Eastern Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45226 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Court, John C. 2205 Park Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45206 / US | 02 /
Zeiter, Theodore R. 3740 Fallen Tree Way Amelia Ohio 45102 / US | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [1988/37] | Application number, filing date | 87305666.7 | 25.06.1987 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | US19870024541 | 11.03.1987 Original published format: US 24541 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0281701 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0281701 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/24, G09F3/04 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
G09F3/04 (EP);
B29C49/24 (EP);
B29C2049/2412 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | In eine Form einzulegendes, synthetisches Schildchen | [1988/37] | English: | Synthetic in-mold label | [1988/37] | French: | Etiquette en matière synthétique pour étiquetage dans le moule | [1988/37] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 11.06.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB1128662 ; | [XD]US4191719 |