EP0256645 - Preparation of pharmaceutical grade pure acid chelates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBION INTERNATIONAL, INC. 101 North Main, P.O.Box 750 Clearfield Utah 84015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states ALBION INTERNATIONAL, INC. 101 North Main, P.O.Box 750 Clearfield Utah 84015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashmead, Harvey Harold 719 E. Center Street Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305813.5 | 01.07.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | US19860882150 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: US 882150 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0256645 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0256645 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256645 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/00, C07C51/41 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
C07C51/41 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/08] | C07C99/00, C07C51/41 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | Herstellung von reinen Aminosäurechelaten der pharmazeutischen Qualität | [1988/08] | English: | Preparation of pharmaceutical grade pure acid chelates | [1988/08] | French: | Fabrication de chélates d'amino-acides d'une pureté de qualité pharmaceutique | [1988/08] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 18.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.1991 | BE | 11.12.1991 | CH | 11.12.1991 | GR | 11.12.1991 | LI | 11.12.1991 | NL | 11.12.1991 | SE | 11.12.1991 | LU | 31.07.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 11.12.1991 | |
BE | 11.12.1991 | ||
CH | 11.12.1991 | ||
LI | 11.12.1991 | ||
NL | 11.12.1991 | ||
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 11.12.1991 | |
BE | 11.12.1991 | ||
CH | 11.12.1991 | ||
LI | 11.12.1991 | ||
NL | 11.12.1991 | ||
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 11.12.1991 | |
CH | 11.12.1991 | ||
LI | 11.12.1991 | ||
NL | 11.12.1991 | ||
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 11.12.1991 | |
LI | 11.12.1991 | ||
NL | 11.12.1991 | ||
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/28] | CH | 11.12.1991 | |
LI | 11.12.1991 | ||
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/27] | CH | 11.12.1991 | |
LI | 11.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2960406 (CARDON BARTLEY P); | [X]GB1019574 (TOHO RAYON KK); | [X]DE2801098 (COCKERILL VERNON); | [AD]US4167564 (JENSEN NED L); | [XD]US4172072 (ASHMEAD HARVEY H [US]); | [XD]US4216143 (ASHMEAD HARVEY H [US]); | [AP]EP0202936 (ALBION LAB [US]) | by applicant | US738065 | US826786 | US2877253 | US2960406 | US3168541 | US3396104 | US3463858 | US3775132 | US3969540 | US4020158 | US4103003 | US4167564 | US4172072 | US4216143 | US4216144 |