EP0251809 - Error detection carried out by the use of unused modulo-m code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizuka, Akira c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Simon John Nye, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Goodman, Simon John Nye, et al Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1988/01] | Pears, David Ashley REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305899.4 | 03.07.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | JP19860155001 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500186 | JP19860155002 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500286 | JP19860155003 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500386 | JP19860155004 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500486 | JP19860155005 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500586 | JP19860155006 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500686 | JP19860155007 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500786 | JP19860155008 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500886 | JP19860155009 | 03.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15500986 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251809 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251809 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251809 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/10 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
G06F11/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Ausführung von Fehlererkennung unter Verwendung eines ungebrauchten Modulo-m-Kodes | [1988/01] | English: | Error detection carried out by the use of unused modulo-m code | [1988/01] | French: | Réalisation de détection d'erreur par l'utilisation d'un code modulo-m non utilisé | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61021534 ; | [A]US3816728 (CHEN T, et al) | [A] - IEE PROCEEDINGS: SOLID STATE AND ELECTRON DEVICES, vol. 133, Part I, no. 3, June 1986, pages 129-139, Stevenage, Herts, GB; I.L. SAYERS et al.: "Design of a reliable and self-testing VLSI datapath using residue coding techniques" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 169 (P-468)[2225], 14th June 1986; & JP-A-61 021 534 (FUJITSU K.K.) 30-01-1986, & JP61021534 A 00000000 |