EP0252702 - Tandem master cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.02.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reynolds, Desmond Henry James 156, Tamworth Road Sutton Coldfield West Midlands / GB | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Waite, Anthony William, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Waite, Anthony William, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305941.4 | 06.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | GB19860016676 | 09.07.1986 Original published format: GB 8616676 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252702 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252702 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/20, B60T11/16 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
B60T11/06 (KR);
B60T11/16 (EP,US);
B60T11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/02] | Title | German: | Tandemhauptzylinder | [1988/02] | English: | Tandem master cylinder | [1988/02] | French: | Maître-cylindre tandem | [1988/02] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/15] | 06.11.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4162616 (HAYASHIDA YOSHIHIRO [JP]); | [Y]EP0104103 (BENDIX CORP [US]); | [Y]DE3544167 (NIPPON AIR BRAKE CO [JP]); | [A]DE619489 (GUSTAVE PROSPER GEORGES RIBIS); | [A]GB1065599 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD); | [A]FR92581E ; | [A]DE1168785 |