Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0298165 | Global Dossier | 19.05.1993 | B1 | EP0298165 | 11.01.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86964486 | 02.06.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3785927T | 03.02.1994 | T2 | DE3785927D1 | 24.06.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US86964486 | 02.06.1986 | EP87305987 | 07.07.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4697254 | 29.09.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US86964486 | 02.06.1986 |