EP0252716 - Process for production of Bishomo- Gamma-Linolenic acid and eicosapentaenoic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP | ||
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states Suntory Limited 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinmen, Yoshifumi 8-1-Enmyojitoriimae Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Hideaki 19-1 Kinomoto-cho Matsugasaki Saky o-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Sakayu 14 Hakuraku-cho Nishinokyo Nakakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305995.0 | 07.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | JP19860158650 | 08.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15865086 | JP19860158651 | 08.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15865186 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252716 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252716 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252716 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, // (C12P7/64, C12R1:645) | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C12P7/6427 (EP,US);
C12P7/6432 (EP,US);
C12P7/6472 (EP,US);
Y10S435/911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bishomo-Gamma-Linolensäure und Eicosapentaensäure | [1988/02] | English: | Process for production of Bishomo- Gamma-Linolenic acid and eicosapentaenoic acid | [1988/02] | French: | Procédé de production de l'acide bishomo-gamma linolénique et de l'acide eicosapentaénique | [1988/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 17.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59130191 ; | [A]JP57144986 ; | [A]EP0125764 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]); | [A]EP0155420 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]); | [A]WO8603518 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) |