EP0252733 - A propulsion system for a water borne vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momot, Adam 2-335 West 15th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia, V5Y 1Y3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states Momot, Adam 2-335 West 15th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia, V5Y 1Y3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Parry, Christopher Stephen, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 87306034.7 | 08.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | CA19860513352 | 08.07.1986 Original published format: CA 513352 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252733 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252733 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B63H19/02, B63H1/36 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
B63H19/02 (EP);
B63H1/36 (EP);
Y02T70/5236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Antriebssystem für ein Wasserfahrzeug | [1988/02] | English: | A propulsion system for a water borne vessel | [1988/02] | French: | Système de propulsion pour embarcation nautique | [1988/02] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.07.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   08.09.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1991 | BE | 27.12.1991 | CH | 27.12.1991 | FR | 27.12.1991 | GR | 27.12.1991 | IT | 27.12.1991 | LI | 27.12.1991 | NL | 27.12.1991 | SE | 27.12.1991 | ES | 07.04.1992 | GB | 08.07.1992 | LU | 31.07.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 27.12.1991 | |
BE | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
GR | 27.12.1991 | ||
IT | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
NL | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
ES | 07.04.1992 | ||
FR | 22.05.1992 | ||
GB | 08.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 27.12.1991 | |
BE | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
GR | 27.12.1991 | ||
IT | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
NL | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
FR | 22.05.1992 | ||
GB | 08.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 27.12.1991 | |
BE | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
IT | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
NL | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
FR | 22.05.1992 | ||
GB | 08.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.12.1991 | |
BE | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
IT | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
NL | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
FR | 22.05.1992 | ||
GB | 08.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/47] | AT | 27.12.1991 | |
BE | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
NL | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
FR | 22.05.1992 | ||
GB | 08.07.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 27.12.1991 | |
BE | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
NL | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
FR | 22.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 27.12.1991 | |
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
NL | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 27.12.1991 | |
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
SE | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/28] | SE | 27.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58133997 ; | [A]US2962283 (CASEY ANDERSON P); | [A]FR1311593 ; | [X]FR2453774 (MARJANOVIC DRAGOLJUB) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 246 (M-253)[1391], 2nd November 1983; & JP-A-58 133 997 (YUTAKA TERAO) 09-08-1983, & JP58133997 A 00000000 |