Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
18.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] |
28.09.1989 | First examination report | |
21.07.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] |
15.01.1988 | Change - applicant | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] |
28.11.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] |