EP0253643 - Fast setting starch-based corrugating adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.B. FULLER LICENSING & FINANCING, INC. 1100 North Market Street, Suite 780 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states H.B. FULLER LICENSING & FINANCING, INC. 1100 North Market Street, Suite 780 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states H.B. FULLER COMPANY 1200 West County Road E Arden Hills, Minnesota 55112 / US | ||
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states H.B. FULLER COMPANY 2400 Energy Park Drive St. Paul Minnesota 55108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murdock, Thomas O. 3999 Clover Avenue Vadnais Heights Minnesota 55105 / US | 02 /
Krankkala, Paul Leonard 7821 Rimbley Road Woodbury Minnesota 55125 / US | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Silverman, Warren, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Silverman, Warren, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87306252.5 | 15.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | US19860885933 | 15.07.1986 Original published format: US 885933 | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253643 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253643 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253643 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09J103/02 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
C09J103/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/54 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24694 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C09J103/02, C08L2666/02, C08L2666/54 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1988/03] | C09J3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | Schnell aushärtender Wellpappenklebstoff auf Basis von Stärke | [1988/03] | English: | Fast setting starch-based corrugating adhesive | [1988/03] | French: | Adhésif à base d'amidon durcissant rapidement pour carton ondulé | [1988/03] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1988/03: A request for correction of the claims pursuant to Rule 88 EPC was filed on 04.08.87. A decision on the request will be taken by the competent Examining Division. | Examination procedure | 15.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP45019600B ; | [X]FR2331591 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [AD]EP0162682 (FULLER H B CO [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 74, no. 2, 11th January 1971, page 76, column 2, abstract no. 4886u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-B-45 019600 (KURASHIKI RAYON CO., LTD) 04-07-1970, & JP45019600B B 00000000 |