EP0254524 - Gas compressor apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENDIX LIMITED Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | [1988/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swinton-Clarke, William James Bentinck Lower Mill Lodge Newnham Lane Old Basing Basingstoke Hants, RG24 O4T / GB | 02 /
Durrant, Jeremy James 15 Isley's Court Longwell Green Bristol, BS15 7DR / GB | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Turner, Alan Reginald BENDIX LIMITED Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | [1988/04] | Application number, filing date | 87306423.2 | 20.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | GB19860018155 | 25.07.1986 Original published format: GB 8618155 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254524 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254524 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254524 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/02 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
F04B49/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1988/04] | Title | German: | Gaskompressor-Steuerung | [1988/04] | English: | Gas compressor apparatus | [1988/04] | French: | Réglage pour compresseur de gaz | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB256530 ; | [X]US2241195 ; | [Y]US2594815 ; | [X]DE2918482 ; | [A]US4384826 ; | [A]DE3324477 |