EP0254557 - A porous structure and a process for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Hitoshi 16-4, Shimizuda Kakemachi Okazaki-shi / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Yukihisa 42, Aza Gomuro Oaza Kusagi, Aguicho Chita-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Miwa, Naoto 28, Ninowari Kabutocho Tsushima-shi / JP | 04 /
Ito, Kazuyuki 24, Sakuramachi-4-chome Nishio-shi / JP | 05 /
Ueda, Naoki 117-22, Kitsuneyama Yokonemachi Obu-shi / JP | 06 /
Miura, Yasunao 96, Hachimancho Kasugai-shi / JP | 07 /
Okamoto, Yasuhide 1-15-41, Meijo-2-chome Kita-ku, Nagoya / JP | 08 /
Kondo, Hiroshi 28-5, Sawatari Takahamamachi Takahama-shi / JP | 09 /
Sugiyama, Tomio NIPPONDENSO Tennocho Shataku, 12 Tennocho-7-chome Kariya-shi / JP | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/04] | Application number, filing date | 87306496.8 | 22.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | JP19860172446 | 22.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17244686 | JP19860313039 | 26.12.1986 Original published format: JP 31303986 | JP19870059193 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5919387 | JP19870077137 | 30.03.1987 Original published format: JP 7713787 | JP19870110353 | 06.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11035387 | JP19870140442 | 04.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14044287 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254557 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254557 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
B01D39/2093 (EP);
C04B38/0051 (EP);
C04B38/0615 (EP);
F01N3/0218 (EP);
F01N3/0222 (EP);
F01N2330/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0615, C04B35/00, C04B38/0051 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/04] | Title | German: | Poröses keramisches Filter und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1988/04] | English: | A porous structure and a process for production thereof | [1988/04] | French: | Structure poreuse et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/04] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 27.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5817840 ; | [A]SU1041531 ; | [A]DE12943 ; | [A]DE549519 (SCHIERITZ PRODUKTE G M B H I L); | [A]DE335747 (ALFRED BRUNO SCHWARZ); | [A]DE1197370 (CHAMOTTE IND); | [A]DE1253132 ; | [A]DE3527872 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [A]US4024212 (DORE JAMES E, et al); | [A]US4056586 (PRYOR MICHAEL J, et al); | [A]GB916784 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 91 (C-162)[1236], 15thApril 1983; & JP - A - 58 17840 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO) 02-02-1983, & JP5817840 A 00000000 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, week 84/22, 11th July 1984, abstract no. 139775, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & SU - A - 1 041 531 (CHEREPANOVA) 29-05-1981, & SU1041531 A 00000000 |