EP0258993 - Production of lactones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1988/10] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheetham, Peter Samuel James 59 Prospect Way Brabourne Lees Nr Ashford Kent / GB | 02 /
Maume, Katherine Ann Aldington Lane Thurnham Maidstone Kent / GB | 03 /
de Rooij, Johannes Franciscus Maria G van Amstelstraat 6 NL-1213 CK Hilversum / NL | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Dries, Antonius Johannes Maria, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Dries, Antonius Johannes Maria, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1990/26] | Gambell, Derek UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/12] | Wiesenhaan, Herman, Drs. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O.Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1988/10] | Roscoe, Brian Corrie UNILEVER PLC Patents Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87306559.3 | 24.07.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | GB19860018351 | 28.07.1986 Original published format: GB 8618351 | [1988/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0258993 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0258993 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0258993 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/42, C12P17/04, C07D307/32, // C12N1/38 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
C07D315/00 (EP);
C12P17/04 (EP);
C12P7/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/10] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Laktonen | [1988/10] | English: | Production of lactones | [1988/10] | French: | Production de lactones | [1988/10] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.1992 | GR | 30.12.1992 | IT | 30.12.1992 | SE | 30.12.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
GR | 30.12.1992 | ||
IT | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
IT | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | SE | 30.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60100508 ; | [A]WO8301072 (FRITZSCHE DODGE & OLCOTT INC [US]); | [A]US4396715 (LABOWS JR JOHN N, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 241 (C-306)[1964], 27th September 1985; & JP-A-60 100 508 (KANEBO K.K.) 04-06-1985, & JP60100508 A 00000000 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 7, 17th February 1986, page 423, no. 49760c, Columbus, Ohio, US; N.JOURDAIN et al.: "Aroma components production by immobilized microbial cells" & TOP. FLAVOUR RES., PROC. INT. CONF. 1985, 427-41 |