EP0256704 - Optical cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telephone Cables Limited Chequers Lane Dagenham Essex RM9 6QA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states Telephone Cables Limited Chequers Lane Dagenham Essex RM9 6QA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peacock, Alan James 2 Hilary Close Hornchurch Essex / GB | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Kirby, Harold Victor Albert The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1988/08] | Application number, filing date | 87306685.6 | 29.07.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | GB19860019308 | 07.08.1986 Original published format: GB 8619308 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256704 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256704 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
G02B6/4422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | Optische Kabel | [1988/08] | English: | Optical cables | [1988/08] | French: | Câbles optiques | [1988/08] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 06.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1992 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4230395 (DEAN NOEL S, et al); | [X]GB2064163 (ASS ELECT IND); | [A]DE3424808 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | Examination | GB2021282 | DE3024310 | EP0060180 |